US HR951 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-3)
Status: Introduced on May 5 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Pending: House Energy And Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Supporting the goals and ideals of National Nurses Week, to be observed from May 6 through May 12, 2020. This resolution expresses support for the goals and ideals of National Nurses Week. It also recognizes the contributions of nurses to the U.S. health care system.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supporting the goals and ideals of National Nurses Week, to be observed from May 6 through May 12, 2020.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-05HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
2020-05-05HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SR224 (Same As) 2019-05-23 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S3127; text: CR S3117)
SR561 (Same As) 2020-05-06 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S2294)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback