US HR932 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 68-28)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research.
Pending: House Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research.
Pending: House Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for the designation of February 19 through February 26, 2022, as "National FFA Week", recognizing the important role of the National Future Farmers of America (referred to in this resolution as "FFA") Organization in developing the next generation of leaders who will change the world, and celebrating 70 years of the National FFA Organization's membership magazine, The National Future Farmer, now called New Horizons.
Title
Expressing support for the designation of February 19 through February 26, 2022, as "National FFA Week", recognizing the important role of the National Future Farmers of America (referred to in this resolution as "FFA") Organization in developing the next generation of leaders who will change the world, and celebrating 70 years of the National FFA Organization's membership magazine, The National Future Farmer, now called New Horizons.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research. |
2022-02-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture. |
2022-02-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR524 (Related) 2022-02-17 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S800; text: CR S794)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-resolution/932/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hres932/BILLS-117hres932ih.pdf |