US SR524 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 35-15-1)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S800; text: CR S794)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S800; text: CR S794)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution expressing support for the designation of February 19 through February 26, 2022, as "National FFA Week", recognizing the important role of the National FFA Organization in developing the next generation of leaders who will change the world, and celebrating 70 years of the National FFA Organization's membership magazine, originally called The National Future Farmer, now called New Horizons.
Title
A resolution expressing support for the designation of February 19 through February 26, 2022, as "National FFA Week", recognizing the important role of the National FFA Organization in developing the next generation of leaders who will change the world, and celebrating 70 years of the National FFA Organization's membership magazine, originally called The National Future Farmer, now called New Horizons.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S800; text: CR S794) |
Same As/Similar To
HR932 (Related) 2022-02-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research.
HR150 (Related) 2021-03-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research.
SR83 (Related) 2021-03-01 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S922; text: CR S960)
HR150 (Related) 2021-03-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research.
SR83 (Related) 2021-03-01 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S922; text: CR S960)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-resolution/524/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/sres524/BILLS-117sres524ats.pdf |