US HR905 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-19 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-19 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution amends H.Res.891 that sets forth the rule for consideration of S.J.Res. 68 (demanding the removal of unauthorized Armed Forces from hostilities in Iran), the Senate amendment to H.B. 2486 (Fostering Undergraduate Talent by Unlocking Resources for Education Act), and H.B. 6172 (USA FREEDOM Reauthorization Act of 2020). The resolution extends through the legislative day of March 29, 2020, by which certain proceedings may take place in the House; the calendar day of March 29, 2020, the authority of the Speaker of the House to suspend the rules; and the legislative day of March 30, 2020, provisions waiving a specified requirement of Rule XIII (Calendar and Committee Reports) to allow consideration of resolutions reported from the Committee on Rules through such legislative day, on the same day they are presented to the House.
Title
Relating to House Resolution 891.
Sponsors
Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-03-19 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H1710) |
2020-03-19 | House | Mr. Raskin asked unanimous consent to consider as introduced. (consideration: CR H1710) |
2020-03-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR891 (Related) 2020-03-11 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-resolution/905/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hres905/BILLS-116hres905eh.pdf |