US HR891 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 28 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-29 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 28 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-29 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.R. 5283) to prohibit the use of Federal funds to provide housing to specified aliens on any land under the administrative jurisdiction of the Federal land management agencies; providing for consideration of the bill (H.R. 5961) to freeze certain Iranian funds involved in the 2023 hostage deal between the United States and Iran, and for other purposes; and providing for consideration of the joint resolution (S. J. Res. 32) providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection relating to "Small Business Lending Under the Equal Credit Opportunity Act (Regulation B)".
Title
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.R. 5283) to prohibit the use of Federal funds to provide housing to specified aliens on any land under the administrative jurisdiction of the Federal land management agencies; providing for consideration of the bill (H.R. 5961) to freeze certain Iranian funds involved in the 2023 hostage deal between the United States and Iran, and for other purposes; and providing for consideration of the joint resolution (S. J. Res. 32) providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by the Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection relating to "Small Business Lending Under the Equal Credit Opportunity Act (Regulation B)".
Sponsors
Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA] |
Roll Calls
2023-11-29 - House - On Agreeing to the Resolution RC# 679 (Y: 212 N: 205 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2023-11-29 - House - On Ordering the Previous Question RC# 678 (Y: 213 N: 205 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2023-11-29 - House - On Ordering the Previous Question RC# 678 (Y: 213 N: 205 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-29 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2023-11-29 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by recorded vote: 212 - 205, 1 Present (Roll no. 679). (text: CR H5945-5946) |
2023-11-29 | House | On ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 213 - 205, 1 Present (Roll no. 678). |
2023-11-29 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 891. |
2023-11-29 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H5945-5956) |
2023-11-28 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 51. |
2023-11-28 | House | The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 5283 and H.R. 5961 under a structured rule and S. J. Res. 32 under a closed rule. Rule provides for one hour of general debate on each measure with one motion to recommit on H.R. 5283 and H.R. 5961 and one motion to commit on S. J. Res. 32. |
2023-11-28 | House | The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 118-280, by Mr. Reschenthaler. |
2023-11-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB5283 (Related) 2023-12-04 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB5961 (Related) 2023-12-04 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
SJR32 (Related) 2024-01-10 - Failed of passage in Senate over veto by Yea-Nay Vote. 54 - 45. Record Vote Number: 5.
HB5961 (Related) 2023-12-04 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
SJR32 (Related) 2024-01-10 - Failed of passage in Senate over veto by Yea-Nay Vote. 54 - 45. Record Vote Number: 5.