US HR845 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Pending: House Oversight And Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Pending: House Oversight And Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizing April 30, 2018, as "El Día de Los Niños-Celebrating Young Americans". Recognizes El Dia de Los Ninos—Celebrating Young Americans.
Title
Recognizing April 30, 2018, as "El Día de Los Niños-Celebrating Young Americans".
Sponsors
Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX] | Rep. Michelle Lujan Grisham [D-NM] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA] |
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA] |
Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2018-04-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR292 (Related) 2017-04-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
SR146 (Related) 2017-04-27 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2631; text: CR S2628)
SR496 (Related) 2018-04-26 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S2498; text: CR S2495)
SR146 (Related) 2017-04-27 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2631; text: CR S2628)
SR496 (Related) 2018-04-26 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S2498; text: CR S2495)
Subjects
Child care and development
Commemorative events and holidays
Community life and organization
Cultural exchanges and relations
Families
Family relationships
Commemorative events and holidays
Community life and organization
Cultural exchanges and relations
Families
Family relationships
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-resolution/845/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hres845/BILLS-115hres845ih.pdf |