US SR146 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2631; text: CR S2628)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2631; text: CR S2628)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution designating April 30, 2017, as El Dia de Los Ninos-Celebrating Young Americans. Designates April 30, 2017, as "El Dia de Los Ninos: Celebrating Young Americans."
Title
A resolution designating April 30, 2017, as El Dia de Los Ninos-Celebrating Young Americans.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Jeff Flake [R-AZ] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] |
Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. John McCain [R-AZ] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] |
Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2631; text: CR S2628) |
Same As/Similar To
HR292 (Related) 2017-04-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
HR845 (Related) 2018-04-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
SR496 (Related) 2018-04-26 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S2498; text: CR S2495)
HR845 (Related) 2018-04-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
SR496 (Related) 2018-04-26 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S2498; text: CR S2495)
Subjects
Child care and development
Commemorative events and holidays
Community life and organization
Cultural exchanges and relations
Families
Family relationships
Commemorative events and holidays
Community life and organization
Cultural exchanges and relations
Families
Family relationships
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-resolution/146/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/sres146/BILLS-115sres146ats.pdf |