US HR844 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-11 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-11 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution sets forth the rule for consideration of H.B. 2546 (Protecting America's Wilderness Act) and H.J.Res. 79 (eliminating the deadline for the ratification of the Equal Rights Amendment, which prohibits discrimination based on sex). It adopts H.Res. 842 (requiring a majority vote of the Members present and voting, a quorum being present, on final passage of H.J.Res. 79). Certain proceedings may take place on any legislative day from February 14, 2020, through February 24, 2020.
Title
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 2546) to designate certain lands in the State of Colorado as components of the National Wilderness Preservation System, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the joint resolution (H.J. Res. 79) removing the deadline for the ratification of the equal rights amendment; and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-11 - House - On agreeing to the resolution RC# 58 (Y: 222 N: 185 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - On ordering the previous question RC# 57 (Y: 222 N: 186 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - On ordering the previous question RC# 57 (Y: 222 N: 186 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-02-11 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 222 - 185 (Roll no. 58). (text: CR H1024) |
2020-02-11 | House | On ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 222 - 186 (Roll no. 57). (consideration: CR H1035-1036) |
2020-02-11 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1035-1037) |
2020-02-11 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H. Res. 833, the Chair put the question on ordering the previous question and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mrs. Lesko demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the question on ordering the previous question until a time to be announced. |
2020-02-11 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 844. |
2020-02-11 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H1024-1029) |
2020-02-10 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 73. |
2020-02-10 | House | The resolution provides for one hour of debate on each measure. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 2546 under a structured rule and consideration of H.J.Res. 79 under a closed rule with a motion to recommit with or without instructions for each measure. |
2020-02-10 | House | The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 116-395, by Ms. Scanlon. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2546 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HR844 (Related) 2020-02-11 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HJR79 (Related) 2020-02-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HR842 (Related) 2020-02-11 - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 844, H. Res. 842 is considered passed House. (consideration: CR H1044; text: CR H1044)
HR844 (Related) 2020-02-11 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HJR79 (Related) 2020-02-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HR842 (Related) 2020-02-11 - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 844, H. Res. 842 is considered passed House. (consideration: CR H1044; text: CR H1044)