US HJR79 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 222-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
This joint resolution eliminates the deadline for the ratification of the Equal Rights Amendment, which prohibits discrimination based on sex. The amendment was proposed to the states in House Joint Resolution 208 of the 92nd Congress, as agreed to in the Senate on March 22, 1972. The amendment shall be part of the Constitution whenever ratified by the legislatures of three-fourths of the states.
Title
Removing the deadline for the ratification of the equal rights amendment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - House - On passage RC# 70 (Y: 232 N: 183 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2020-02-13 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-02-13 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 232 - 183 (Roll no. 70). (text: CR H1129) |
2020-02-13 | House | POINT OF ORDER - Mr. Sensenbrenner raised a point of order against the vote on passage of the joint resolution, stating that the vote required a two-thirds vote to amend the Constitution. The Chair overruled the point of order, pursuant to H.Res. 842, an affirmative vote of a majority of Members present and voting, is required on final passage of H.J. Res. 79. Mr. Sensenbrenner appealed the ruling of the Chair, and the Chair advised that she had not issued an appealable ruling and thus put the question on passage of the joint resolution. |
2020-02-13 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2020-02-13 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.J. Res. 79. |
2020-02-13 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2546 and H.J. Res. 79. The resolution provides for one hour of debate on each measure. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 2546 under a structured rule and consideration of H.J.Res. 79 under a closed rule with a motion to recommit with or without instructions for each measure. |
2020-02-13 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 844. (consideration: CR H1129-1143) |
2020-02-11 | House | Rule H. Res. 844 passed House. |
2020-02-10 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 844 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2546 and H.J. Res. 79. The resolution provides for one hour of debate on each measure. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 2546 under a structured rule and consideration of H.J.Res. 79 under a closed rule with a motion to recommit with or without instructions for each measure. |
2020-01-16 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 70. |
2020-01-16 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-378. |
2019-11-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended). |
2019-11-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-11-12 | House | Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties Discharged. |
2019-11-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties. |
2019-11-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-11-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HJR38 (Related) 2019-01-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SJR6 (Same As) 2019-01-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HR844 (Related) 2020-02-11 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR842 (Related) 2020-02-11 - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 844, H. Res. 842 is considered passed House. (consideration: CR H1044; text: CR H1044)
SJR6 (Same As) 2019-01-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HR844 (Related) 2020-02-11 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR842 (Related) 2020-02-11 - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 844, H. Res. 842 is considered passed House. (consideration: CR H1044; text: CR H1044)
Subjects
Civil rights and liberties, minority issues
Constitution and constitutional amendments
Due process and equal protection
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Women's rights
Constitution and constitutional amendments
Due process and equal protection
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Women's rights