US HR841 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 19 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 19 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Sets forth the rule for consideration of the Senate amendment to the joint resolution (H.J. Res. 66) approving the renewal of import restrictions contained in the Burmese Freedom and Democracy Act of 2003, and providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 6684) to provide for spending reduction.
Title
Providing for consideration of the Senate amendment to the joint resolution (H.J. Res. 66) approving the renewal of import restrictions contained in the Burmese Freedom and Democracy Act of 2003, and providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 6684) to provide for spending reduction.
Sponsors
Rep. David Dreier [R-CA] |
Roll Calls
2012-12-20 - House - On Agreeing to the Resolution (Y: 219 N: 197 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-20 - House - On Ordering the Previous Question (Y: 233 N: 184 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-20 - House - On Agreeing to the Resolution (Y: 219 N: 197 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-20 - House - On Ordering the Previous Question (Y: 233 N: 184 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-20 - House - On Ordering the Previous Question (Y: 233 N: 184 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-20 - House - On Agreeing to the Resolution (Y: 219 N: 197 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-20 - House - On Ordering the Previous Question (Y: 233 N: 184 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-20 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2012-12-20 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 219 - 197 (Roll no. 640). (text: CR H7374) |
2012-12-20 | House | On ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 233 - 184 (Roll no. 639). (consideration: CR H7381-7382) |
2012-12-20 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 841. |
2012-12-20 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H7374-7383) |
2012-12-19 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 170. |
2012-12-19 | House | The resolution provides for consideration of the Senate amendment to H.J.Res. 66 and for consideration of H.R. 6684. The resolution makes in order a motion offered by the chair of the Committee on Ways and Means that the House concur in the Senate amendment to H.J.Res. 66 with the amendment printed in House Report 112-708. The resolution provides for one hour of debate in both instances. The Senate amendment, the motion, and H.R. 6684 shall be considered as read. The resolution provides for one motion to recommit for H.R. 6684. |
2012-12-19 | House | The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 112-708, by Mr. Dreier. |
Same As/Similar To
HJR66 (Related) 2011-09-15 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HB6684 (Related) 2012-12-21 - Received in the Senate.
HB6684 (Related) 2012-12-21 - Received in the Senate.