US HR826 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-06 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-06 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution expresses the sense of the House of Representatives that the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services (CMS) should withdraw recent guidance regarding the approval of block grants under Medicaid demonstration waivers. On January 30, 2020, the CMS issued guidance allowing states to apply for capped block grants through Medicaid demonstration waivers, particularly in order to cover services for the Medicaid expansion population (i.e., adults under the age of 65). The guidance also allows states that receive such block grants to make other changes to their programs (e.g., formularies for prescription drugs).
Title
Expressing disapproval of the Trump administration's harmful actions towards Medicaid.
Sponsors
Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX] | Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA] | Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA] |
Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS] | Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI] | Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-06 - House - On agreeing to the resolution RC# 51 (Y: 223 N: 190 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-02-06 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 223 - 190 (Roll no. 51). (text: CR H870) |
2020-02-06 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H928) |
2020-02-06 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.Res. 826, the Chair put the question on adoption of the resolution, announced by voice vote, that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Walden demanded the yeas and nays, and the Chair postponed further proceedings on H.Res. 826 until a time to be announced. |
2020-02-06 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2020-02-06 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 826. |
2020-02-06 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H. Res. 826, H.R. 2474 and H.R. 5687. The resolution provides for consideration of H.Res. 826 under a closed rule with one hour of debate. Also, the resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 2474, under a structured rule and consideration of H.R. 5687, under a structured rule. Each bill shall be debated for one hour. |
2020-02-06 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 833. (consideration: CR H870-878) |
2020-02-05 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 833 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H. Res. 826, H.R. 2474 and H.R. 5687. The resolution provides for consideration of H.Res. 826 under a closed rule with one hour of debate. Also, the resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 2474, under a structured rule and consideration of H.R. 5687, under a structured rule. Each bill shall be debated for one hour. |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2020-02-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR833 (Related) 2020-02-06 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health programs administration and funding
Medicaid
Presidential administrations
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health programs administration and funding
Medicaid
Presidential administrations