US HR777 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on September 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-10-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-10-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Commends the 5 living and 80 original members of the Doolittle Tokyo Raiders for their participation in the Tokyo, Japan, bombing raid of April 18, 1942. Recognizes the valor, skill, and courage of the Raiders that proved invaluable to the eventual defeat of Japan during the Second World War. Acknowledges that the actions of the Raiders helped to forge an enduring example of heroism in the face of uncertainty for the Army Air Corps of the Second World War, the future of the Air Force, and the United States as a whole.
Title
Commemorating the 70th anniversary and commending the brave men of the 17th Bombardment Group (Medium) who became known as the "Doolittle Tokyo Raiders" for outstanding heroism, valor, skill, and service to the United States in conducting the bombing of Tokyo on April 18, 1942.
Sponsors
Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX] | Rep. Steve Austria [R-OH] | Rep. Charles Bass [R-NH] | Rep. Madeleine Bordallo [D-GU] |
Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-10-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2012-09-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
Same As/Similar To
SR418 (Same As) 2012-08-02 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S6011)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-resolution/777/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hres777/BILLS-112hres777ih.pdf |