US HR756 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-11-18 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-11-18 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Sets forth the rule for consideration of the bill (H.B. 1422) to amend the Environmental Research, Development, and Demonstration Authorization Act of 1978 to provide for Scientific Advisory Board member qualifications, public participation, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 4012) to prohibit the Environmental Protection Agency from proposing, finalizing, or disseminating regulations or assessments based upon science that is not transparent or reproducible; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 4795) to promote new manufacturing in the United States by providing for greater transparency and timeliness in obtaining necessary permits, and for other purposes; and providing for proceedings during the period from November 21, 2014, through November 28, 2014.
Title
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 1422) to amend the Environmental Research, Development, and Demonstration Authorization Act of 1978 to provide for Scientific Advisory Board member qualifications, public participation, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 4012) to prohibit the Environmental Protection Agency from proposing, finalizing, or disseminating regulations or assessments based upon science that is not transparent or reproducible; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 4795) to promote new manufacturing in the United States by providing for greater transparency and timeliness in obtaining necessary permits, and for other purposes; and providing for proceedings during the period from November 21, 2014, through November 28, 2014.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] |
Roll Calls
2014-11-18 - House - On Agreeing to the Resolution (Y: 227 N: 192 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-18 - House - On Ordering the Previous Question (Y: 225 N: 190 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-18 - House - On Ordering the Previous Question (Y: 225 N: 190 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-18 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2014-11-18 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by recorded vote: 227 - 192 (Roll no. 522). (text: CR H8045) |
2014-11-18 | House | On ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 225 - 190 (Roll no. 521). (consideration: CR H8049-8050) |
2014-11-18 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 756. |
2014-11-18 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H8045-8050) |
2014-11-17 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 146. |
2014-11-17 | House | The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 1422, H.R. 4012, and H.R. 4795. General debate is limited to 1 hour for each bill. The resolution specifies certain amendments are in order for H.R. 1422, H.R. 4012, and H.R. 4795. One motion to recommit with instructions is permitted for each bill. |
2014-11-17 | House | The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 113-626, by Mr. Burgess. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1422 (Related) 2014-11-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HB4012 (Related) 2014-11-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HB4795 (Related) 2014-12-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HB4012 (Related) 2014-11-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HB4795 (Related) 2014-12-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.