US HR742 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 23 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for consideration of the Senate amendment to the bill (H.B. 2576) to modernize the Toxic Substances Control Act, and for other purposes, and providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 897) to amend the Federal Insecticide, Fungicide, and Rodenticide Act and the Federal Water Pollution Control Act to clarify Congressional intent regarding the regulation of the use of pesticides in or near navigable waters, and for other purposes. Sets forth the rule for consideration of the Senate amendment to the bill (H.B. 2576) to modernize the Toxic Substances Control Act, and for other purposes, and providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 897) to amend the Federal Insecticide, Fungicide, and Rodenticide Act and the Federal Water Pollution Control Act to clarify Congressional intent regarding the regulation of the use of pesticides in or near navigable waters.
Title
Providing for consideration of the Senate amendment to the bill (H.B. 2576) to modernize the Toxic Substances Control Act, and for other purposes, and providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 897) to amend the Federal Insecticide, Fungicide, and Rodenticide Act and the Federal Water Pollution Control Act to clarify Congressional intent regarding the regulation of the use of pesticides in or near navigable waters, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Rob Woodall [R-GA] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-24 - House - On Agreeing to the Resolution (Y: 238 N: 171 NV: 24 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - House - On Ordering the Previous Question (Y: 234 N: 175 NV: 24 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - House - On Ordering the Previous Question (Y: 234 N: 175 NV: 24 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-24 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-05-24 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by recorded vote: 238 - 171 (Roll no. 234). (text: CR H2975) |
2016-05-24 | House | On ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 234 - 175 (Roll no. 233). (consideration: CR H2981, H2987) |
2016-05-24 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2987-2988) |
2016-05-24 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H. Res. 742, the Chair put the question on ordering the previous question and by voice vote announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Polis demanded the yeas and nays, and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the question of ordering the previous question until later in the legislative day. |
2016-05-24 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 742. |
2016-05-24 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H2975-2981) |
2016-05-23 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 117. |
2016-05-23 | House | Resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 897 and the Senate amendment to H.R. 2576. |
2016-05-23 | House | The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 114-590, by Mr. Woodall. |
Same As/Similar To
HB897 (Related) 2016-07-14 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 570.
HB2576 (Related) 2016-06-22 - Became Public Law No: 114-182. (TXT | PDF)
HB2576 (Related) 2016-06-22 - Became Public Law No: 114-182. (TXT | PDF)