US HB897 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-14 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 570.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-14 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 570.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Zika Vector Control Act This bill amends the Federal Insecticide, Fungicide, and Rodenticide Act (FIFRA) and the Federal Water Pollution Control Act (commonly known as the Clean Water Act) to prohibit the Environmental Protection Agency or a state from requiring a permit under the Clean Water Act for a discharge from a point source into navigable waters of a pesticide authorized for sale, distribution, or use under FIFRA, or a residue resulting from the application of the pesticide. Point source pollution is waste discharged from a distinct place, such as a pipe, channel, or tunnel. The bill establishes exemptions for the following discharges containing a pesticide or pesticide residue: (1) a discharge resulting from the application of a pesticide in violation of FIFRA that is relevant to protecting water quality, if the discharge would not have occurred but for the violation or the amount of pesticide or pesticide residue contained in the discharge is greater than would have occurred without the violation; (2) stormwater discharges regulated under the National Pollutant Discharge Elimination System (NPDES); and (3) discharges regulated under NPDES of manufacturing or industrial effluent or treatment works effluent and discharges incidental to the normal operation of a vessel, including a discharge resulting from operations concerning ballast water held in ships to increase stability or vessel biofouling prevention.
Title
Zika Vector Control Act
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Gibbs [R-OH] | Rep. Sam Graves [R-MO] | Rep. Steve Scalise [R-LA] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-24 - House - On Passage (Y: 258 N: 156 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - House - On Motion to Recommit with Instructions (Y: 182 N: 232 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-17 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 262 N: 159 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
Senate - On the Cloture Motion H.R. 2577 (Y: 52 N: 46 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
Senate - On the Cloture Motion H.R. 2577 (Y: 52 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-24 - House - On Motion to Recommit with Instructions (Y: 182 N: 232 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-17 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 262 N: 159 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
Senate - On the Cloture Motion H.R. 2577 (Y: 52 N: 46 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
Senate - On the Cloture Motion H.R. 2577 (Y: 52 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-14 | Senate | Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 570. |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2016-05-24 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-05-24 | House | On passage Passed by recorded vote: 258 - 156 (Roll no. 237). (text: CR H3031) |
2016-05-24 | House | On motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 182 - 232 (Roll no. 236). (consideration: CR H3046) |
2016-05-24 | House | The previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection. (consideration: CR H3045) |
2016-05-24 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Ruiz motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment to add at the end of the bill a section protecting pregnant women and children from pesticides known or suspected to cause adverse health impacts on pregnant women, fetal growth, or early childhood development. |
2016-05-24 | House | Mr. Ruiz moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on Transportation. (consideration: CR H3044; text: CR H3044) |
2016-05-24 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H3044) |
2016-05-24 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 897. |
2016-05-24 | House | Resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 897 and the Senate amendment to H.R. 2576. |
2016-05-24 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 742. (consideration: CR H3031-3046) |
2016-05-23 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 742 Reported to House. Resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 897 and the Senate amendment to H.R. 2576. |
2016-05-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 262 - 159 (Roll no. 199). (text: H2446) |
2016-05-17 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2457-2458) |
2016-05-17 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2016-05-17 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 897. |
2016-05-17 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2446-2455) |
2016-05-17 | House | Mr. Gibbs moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2015-03-19 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2015-03-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research. |
2015-02-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred to House Agriculture |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-02-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1500 (Related) 2015-10-29 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 284.
HR742 (Related) 2016-05-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB659 (Related) 2016-02-24 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 371.
HB2577 (Related) 2016-09-06 - Second cloture on the conference report not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 52 - 46. Record Vote Number: 135. (consideration: CR S5229-5240; text: CR S5239)
HR742 (Related) 2016-05-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB659 (Related) 2016-02-24 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 371.
HB2577 (Related) 2016-09-06 - Second cloture on the conference report not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 52 - 46. Record Vote Number: 135. (consideration: CR S5229-5240; text: CR S5239)
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Licensing and registrations
Pest management
State and local government operations
Water quality
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Licensing and registrations
Pest management
State and local government operations
Water quality