US HR724 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-6)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Supporting the goals and ideals of National Nurses Week on May 6, 2016, through May 12, 2016. Expresses support for the goals and ideals of National Nurses Week. Recognizes the contributions of nurses to the U.S. health care system.
Title
Supporting the goals and ideals of National Nurses Week on May 6, 2016, through May 12, 2016.
Sponsors
Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] | Rep. Corrine Brown [D-FL] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] |
Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. Lois Capps [D-CA] | Rep. Donna Edwards [D-MD] |
Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Keith Ellison [D-MN] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] | Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] |
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Renee Ellmers [R-NC] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA] |
Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA] | Rep. John Lewis [D-GA] | Rep. Madeleine Bordallo [D-GU] | Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] |
Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA] | Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] |
Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] | Rep. Diane Black [R-TN] | Rep. Louise Slaughter [D-NY] |
Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2016-05-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2016-05-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR257 (Same As) 2015-05-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SR178 (Same As) 2015-05-12 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2798-2799)
SR467 (Same As) 2016-05-16 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2832; text as passed Senate: CR S2827)
SR178 (Same As) 2015-05-12 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2798-2799)
SR467 (Same As) 2016-05-16 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2832; text as passed Senate: CR S2827)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-resolution/724/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hres724/BILLS-114hres724ih.pdf |