US HR680 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-19 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-19 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.R. 1435) to amend the Clean Air Act to prevent the elimination of the sale of internal combustion engines, and providing for consideration of the bill (H.R. 4365) making appropriations for the Department of Defense for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2024, and for other purposes.
Title
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.R. 1435) to amend the Clean Air Act to prevent the elimination of the sale of internal combustion engines, and providing for consideration of the bill (H.R. 4365) making appropriations for the Department of Defense for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2024, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] |
Roll Calls
2023-09-19 - House - On Agreeing to the Resolution RC# 398 (Y: 212 N: 214 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2023-09-19 - House - On Ordering the Previous Question RC# 397 (Y: 217 N: 209 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-09-19 - House - On Ordering the Previous Question RC# 397 (Y: 217 N: 209 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-19 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2023-09-19 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Failed by recorded vote: 212 - 214 (Roll no. 398). |
2023-09-19 | House | Failed of passage/not agreed to in House On agreeing to the resolution Failed by recorded vote: 212 - 214 (Roll no. 398). |
2023-09-19 | House | On ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 217 - 209 (Roll no. 397). |
2023-09-19 | House | Considered as unfinished business. |
2023-09-19 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H. Res. 680, the Chair put the question on ordering the previous question and by voice vote announced that the ayes had prevailed. Ms. Leger Fernandez demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced. |
2023-09-19 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 680. |
2023-09-19 | House | Considered as privileged matter. |
2023-09-13 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 33. |
2023-09-13 | House | The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 1435 under a closed rule and H.R. 4365 under a structured rule. The rule provides for one hour of general debate on each measure with one motion to recommit allowed. |
2023-09-13 | House | The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 118-193, by Mr. Cole. |
2023-09-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1435 (Related) 2023-09-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HB4365 (Related) 2023-10-16 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 226.
HR681 (Related) 2023-09-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB4365 (Related) 2023-10-16 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 226.
HR681 (Related) 2023-09-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.