US HR666 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-5)
Status: Introduced on September 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for the designation of the week of September 20 through September 26, 2021, as "Rail Safety Week" in the United States, and supporting the goals and ideals of Rail Safety Week to reduce rail-related accidents, fatalities, and injuries.
Title
Expressing support for the designation of the week of September 20 through September 26, 2021, as "Rail Safety Week" in the United States, and supporting the goals and ideals of Rail Safety Week to reduce rail-related accidents, fatalities, and injuries.
Sponsors
Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL] | Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] |
Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. Marie Newman [D-IL] | Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA] |
Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] |
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY] | Rep. Carlos Gimenez [R-FL] | Rep. Nikema Williams [D-GA] |
Rep. Frank Mrvan [D-IN] | Rep. John Katko [R-NY] | Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials. |
2021-09-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2021-09-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR382 (Same As) 2021-09-23 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6666-6667; text: CR S6679)
HR1371 (Related) 2022-09-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
SR798 (Related) 2022-09-27 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5112; text: CR S5056-5057)
HR1371 (Related) 2022-09-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
SR798 (Related) 2022-09-27 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5112; text: CR S5056-5057)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-resolution/666/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hres666/BILLS-117hres666ih.pdf |