US HR608 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Europe, Eurasia, and Emerging Threats.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Europe, Eurasia, and Emerging Threats Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Europe, Eurasia, and Emerging Threats.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Europe, Eurasia, and Emerging Threats Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives that the 85th anniversary of the Ukrainian Famine-Genocide of 1932-1933 (Holodomor) should serve as a reminder of repressive Soviet policies against the people of Ukraine. Recognizes the 85th anniversary of the Ukrainian Famine (Holodomor) of 1932-1933 and extends sympathies to the victims, survivors, and families of that tragedy. Encourages dissemination of information regarding the famine. Condemns the systematic violations of human rights of the Ukrainian people by the Soviet government. Supports the continuing efforts of the people of Ukraine to work toward ensuring democratic principles, a free-market economy, and full respect for human rights.
Title
Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives that the 85th anniversary of the Ukrainian Famine-Genocide of 1932-1933 (Holodomor) should serve as a reminder of repressive Soviet policies against the people of Ukraine.
Sponsors
Rep. Sander Levin [D-MI] | Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Andy Harris [R-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Europe, Eurasia, and Emerging Threats. |
2017-11-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2017-11-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR435 (Related) 2018-10-03 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6503-6504; text: CR S6503-6504)
HR931 (Related) 2018-12-11 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR931 (Related) 2018-12-11 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Europe
Food supply, safety, and labeling
Human rights
International affairs
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Ukraine
War crimes, genocide, crimes against humanity
Congressional tributes
Europe
Food supply, safety, and labeling
Human rights
International affairs
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Ukraine
War crimes, genocide, crimes against humanity
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-resolution/608/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hres608/BILLS-115hres608ih.pdf |