US HR931 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-12)
Status: Introduced on June 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-11 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-11 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives that the 85th anniversary of the Ukrainian Famine of 1932-1933, known as the Holodomor, should serve as a reminder of repressive Soviet policies against the people of Ukraine.
Title
Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives that the 85th anniversary of the Ukrainian Famine of 1932-1933, known as the Holodomor, should serve as a reminder of repressive Soviet policies against the people of Ukraine.
Sponsors
Rep. Sander Levin [D-MI] | Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] | Rep. Nita Lowey [D-NY] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] |
Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL] | Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT] | Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Rep. Andy Harris [R-MD] | Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] | Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] |
Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA] | Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] |
Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. Ryan Costello [R-PA] | Rep. David Price [D-NC] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] |
Rep. Peter Roskam [R-IL] | Rep. John Curtis [R-UT] | Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL] | Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY] |
Rep. Ted Poe [R-TX] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] |
Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] |
Rep. Scott Perry [R-PA] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-11 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-12-11 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (CR text: H10079-10080) |
2018-12-11 | House | H.Amdt.983 On agreeing to the Royce (CA) amendment (A001) Agreed to without objection. |
2018-12-11 | House | H.Amdt.983 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. Royce (CA). (consideration: CR H10080; text: CR H10080) |
2018-12-11 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H10079-10080) |
2018-12-11 | House | Committee on Foreign Affairs discharged. |
2018-12-11 | House | Mr. Royce (CA) asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. |
2018-09-27 | House | Committee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules, by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-09-27 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-09-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-06-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2018-06-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR608 (Related) 2017-11-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Europe, Eurasia, and Emerging Threats.
SR435 (Same As) 2018-10-03 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6503-6504; text: CR S6503-6504)
SR435 (Same As) 2018-10-03 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6503-6504; text: CR S6503-6504)