US HR556 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 92-32)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-01 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-01 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Condemns Iran for its systemic violations of the human rights of the Iranian people, including the state-sponsored persecution of religious minorities in Iran, and its continued failure to uphold its international obligations, including with respect to the Universal Declaration of Human Rights and the International Covenant on Civil and Political Rights. Calls on Iran to exonerate and release Youcef Nadarkhani and all other individuals held or charged on account of their religious or political beliefs. Calls on the Administration to designate Iranian officials for human rights abuses. Reaffirms that freedom of religious practice is a universal human right and a fundamental individual freedom that every government must protect.
Title
Condemning the Government of Iran for its continued persecution, imprisonment, and sentencing of Youcef Nadarkhani on the charge of apostasy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-01 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Agree, as Amended (Y: 417 N: 1 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Agree, as Amended (Y: 417 N: 1 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Agree, as Amended (Y: 417 N: 1 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-01 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2012-03-01 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 417 - 1 (Roll no. 94). (text: CR 3/1/2012 CR H1087) |
2012-03-01 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1113-1114) |
2012-02-29 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2012-02-29 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 556. |
2012-02-29 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1087-1091) |
2012-02-29 | House | Mr. Pitts moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended. |
2012-02-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
SR385 (Related) 2012-06-20 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 431.
HR562 (Related) 2012-03-01 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR562 (Related) 2012-03-01 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Detention of persons
Human rights
International affairs
International law and treaties
Iran
Middle East
Protest and dissent
Religion
Sanctions
Human rights
International affairs
International law and treaties
Iran
Middle East
Protest and dissent
Religion
Sanctions