US HR553 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on July 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Of inquiry requesting the President and directing the Secretary of Health and Human Services and the Secretary of Homeland Security to transmit, respectively, certain documents to the House of Representatives relating to unaccompanied alien children.
Title
Of inquiry requesting the President and directing the Secretary of Health and Human Services and the Secretary of Homeland Security to transmit, respectively, certain documents to the House of Representatives relating to unaccompanied alien children.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] | Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA] | Rep. John Katko [R-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2021-07-27 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H3926) |
2021-07-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2021-07-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR1343 (Same As) 2022-10-14 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 146.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-resolution/553/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hres553/BILLS-117hres553ih.pdf |