US HR510 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Introduced on June 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizing the month of June as "Immigrant Heritage Month", a celebration of the accomplishments and contributions immigrants and their children have made in making the United States a healthier, safer, more diverse, prosperous country, and acknowledging the importance of immigrants and their children to the future successes of the United States.
Title
Recognizing the month of June as "Immigrant Heritage Month", a celebration of the accomplishments and contributions immigrants and their children have made in making the United States a healthier, safer, more diverse, prosperous country, and acknowledging the importance of immigrants and their children to the future successes of the United States.
Sponsors
Rep. Ritchie Torres [D-NY] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] | Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] |
Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] | Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] | Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] |
Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX] | Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA] | Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA] | Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] |
Rep. Michael San Nicolas [D-GU] | Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA] |
Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] | Rep. Al Green [D-TX] | Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] |
Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA] |
Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX] |
Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2021-06-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2021-06-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR294 (Related) 2021-06-24 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S4786-4787)
HR1181 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
SR678 (Related) 2022-06-15 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HR1181 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
SR678 (Related) 2022-06-15 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-resolution/510/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hres510/BILLS-117hres510ih.pdf |