US HR48 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-05 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-05 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Sets forth the rule for consideration of the bill (H.B. 444) to require that, if the President's fiscal year 2014 budget does not achieve balance in a fiscal year covered by such budget, the President shall submit a supplemental unified budget by April 1, 2013, which identifies a fiscal year in which balance is achieved.
Title
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 444) to require that, if the President's fiscal year 2014 budget does not achieve balance in a fiscal year covered by such budget, the President shall submit a supplemental unified budget by April 1, 2013, which identifies a fiscal year in which balance is achieved, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Rob Woodall [R-GA] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-05 - House - On Agreeing to the Resolution (Y: 228 N: 189 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - On Ordering the Previous Question (Y: 229 N: 188 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - On Ordering the Previous Question (Y: 229 N: 188 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-05 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2013-02-05 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by recorded vote: 228 - 189 (Roll no. 34). (text: CR H354) |
2013-02-05 | House | On ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 229 - 188 (Roll no. 33). (consideration: CR H362-363) |
2013-02-05 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 48. |
2013-02-05 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H354-363, H363-364) |
2013-02-04 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 3. |
2013-02-04 | House | The resolution waives all points of order against consideration of the bill, and amendments printed in the report. Each amendment shall not be subject to amendment, and shall not be subject to a demand for division of the question in the House or in the Committee of the Whole. |
2013-02-04 | House | The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 113-8, by Mr. Woodall. |
Same As/Similar To
HB444 (Related) 2013-02-07 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Budget.