US HR43 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-16 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 268) making supplemental appropriations for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2019, and for other purposes, and waiving a requirement of clause 6(a) of rule XIII with respect to consideration of certain resolutions reported from the Committee on Rules. Sets forth the rule for consideration of the bill (H.B. 268) making supplemental appropriations for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2019, and for other purposes, and waiving a requirement of clause 6(a) of rule XIII with respect to consideration of certain resolutions reported from the Committee on Rules.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 268) making supplemental appropriations for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2019, and for other purposes, and waiving a requirement of clause 6(a) of rule XIII with respect to consideration of certain resolutions reported from the Committee on Rules.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-16 - House - On agreeing to the resolution RC# 35 (Y: 230 N: 193 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - On ordering the previous question RC# 34 (Y: 230 N: 194 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-16HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-01-16HouseOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 230 - 193 (Roll no. 35). (text: CR H618)
2019-01-16HouseOn ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 230 - 194 (Roll no. 34). (consideration: CR H624-625)
2019-01-16HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 43.
2019-01-16HouseConsidered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H618-626)
2019-01-15HousePlaced on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 2.
2019-01-15HouseThe resolution waives all points of order against consideration of the bill. The resolution waives clause 6(a) of rule XIII with respect to resolutions reported from the Rules Committee through the legislative day of January 23, 2019, making or continuing appropriations for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2019.
2019-01-15HouseThe House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 116-2, by Mr. Raskin.

Same As/Similar To

HB268 (Related) 2019-04-01 - Motion by Senator McConnell to reconsider the vote by which cloture on H.R. 268 was not invoked (Record Vote No. 56) entered in Senate.
HR43 (Similar To) 2019-01-16 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback