US HR38 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 161) to provide for the timely consideration of all licenses, permits, and approvals required under Federal law with respect to the siting, construction, expansion, or operation of any natural gas pipeline projects, and providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 36) to amend title 18, United States Code, to protect pain-capable unborn children, and for other purposes. Sets forth the rule for consideration of the bill (H.B. 161) to provide for the timely consideration of all licenses, permits, and approvals required under Federal law with respect to the siting, construction, expansion, or operation of any natural gas pipeline projects, and providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 36) to amend title 18, United States Code, to protect pain-capable unborn children.
Title
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 161) to provide for the timely consideration of all licenses, permits, and approvals required under Federal law with respect to the siting, construction, expansion, or operation of any natural gas pipeline projects, and providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 36) to amend title 18, United States Code, to protect pain-capable unborn children, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Virginia Foxx [R-NC] |
Roll Calls
2015-01-21 - House - On Agreeing to the Resolution (Y: 238 N: 181 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - House - On Ordering the Previous Question (Y: 238 N: 182 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - House - On Ordering the Previous Question (Y: 238 N: 182 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-01-21 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by recorded vote: 238 - 181 (Roll no. 39). (text: CR H443-444) |
2015-01-21 | House | On ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 238 - 182 (Roll no. 38). (consideration: CR H452) |
2015-01-21 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 38. |
2015-01-21 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H443-453) |
2015-01-20 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 3. |
2015-01-20 | House | The rule provides for one hour of debate on each measure. The resolution waives all points of order against consideration of the bills. The resolution provides that the bills shall be considered as read. The resolution waives all points of order against provisions in the bills. The resolution provides one motion to recommit per bill. |
2015-01-20 | House | The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 114-3, by Ms. Foxx. |
Same As/Similar To
HB36 (Related) 2015-09-22 - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S6868)
HB161 (Related) 2015-01-22 - Received in the Senate.
HB161 (Related) 2015-01-22 - Received in the Senate.