US HR369 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-22 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-22 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 1599) to amend the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act with respect to food produced from, containing, or consisting of a bioengineered organism, the labeling of natural foods, and for other purposes, and providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 1734) to amend subtitle D of the Solid Waste Disposal Act to encourage recovery and beneficial use of coal combustion residuals and establish requirements for the proper management and disposal of coal combustion residuals that are protective of human health and the environment. Sets forth the rule for consideration of the bill (H.B. 1599) to amend the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act with respect to food produced from, containing, or consisting of a bioengineered organism, the labeling of natural foods, and for other purposes, and providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 1734) to amend subtitle D of the Solid Waste Disposal Act to encourage recovery and beneficial use of coal combustion residuals and establish requirements for the proper management and disposal of coal combustion residuals that are protective of human health and the environment.
Title
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 1599) to amend the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act with respect to food produced from, containing, or consisting of a bioengineered organism, the labeling of natural foods, and for other purposes, and providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 1734) to amend subtitle D of the Solid Waste Disposal Act to encourage recovery and beneficial use of coal combustion residuals and establish requirements for the proper management and disposal of coal combustion residuals that are protective of human health and the environment.
Sponsors
Rep. Bradley Byrne [R-AL] |
Roll Calls
2015-07-22 - House - On Agreeing to the Resolution (Y: 242 N: 175 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-22 - House - On Ordering the Previous Question (Y: 239 N: 167 NV: 27 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-22 - House - On Ordering the Previous Question (Y: 239 N: 167 NV: 27 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-22 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-07-22 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by recorded vote: 242 - 175 (Roll no. 451). (text: CR H5345-5346) |
2015-07-22 | House | On ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 239 - 167 (Roll no. 450). (consideration: CR H5355-5356) |
2015-07-22 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 369. |
2015-07-22 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H5345-5357) |
2015-07-21 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 49. |
2015-07-21 | House | Resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 1599 and H.R. 1734. |
2015-07-21 | House | The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 114-216, by Mr. Byrne. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1599 (Related) 2015-07-24 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
HB1734 (Related) 2016-07-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HB1734 (Related) 2016-07-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.