US HR356 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-11)
Status: Introduced on September 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-09-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-09-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes that: (1) access to hospitals and other health care providers for patients in rural areas of the United States is essential to the survival and success of U.S. communities; (2) preserving and strengthening access to quality health care in rural areas is crucial to the success and prosperity of the United States; (3) strengthening access to hospitals and other health care providers for patients in rural areas makes Medicare more cost-effective and improves health outcomes for patients, and (4) rural health care providers are integral to the local economies and are one of the largest types of employers in rural areas of the United States. Celebrates the many dedicated medical professionals across the United States who work hard each day to deliver quality care to people living in rural areas.
Title
Recognizing that access to hospitals and other health care providers for patients in rural areas of the United States is essential to the survival and success of communities in the United States.
Sponsors
Rep. Lynn Jenkins [R-KS] | Rep. Michele Bachmann [R-MN] | Rep. Dan Benishek [R-MI] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] |
Rep. Chris Collins [R-NY] | Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Rep. Eric Crawford [R-AR] |
Rep. Sean Duffy [R-WI] | Rep. William Enyart [D-IL] | Rep. Randy Forbes [R-VA] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] |
Rep. Joe Garcia [D-FL] | Rep. Tim Griffin [R-AR] | Rep. Tim Huelskamp [R-KS] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] |
Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ] | Rep. John Kline [R-MN] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] |
Rep. Tom Latham [R-IA] | Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA] | Rep. Vance McAllister [R-LA] | Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] |
Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA] | Rep. Richard Nolan [D-MN] | Rep. Erik Paulsen [R-MN] | Rep. Collin Peterson [D-MN] |
Rep. David Reichert [R-WA] | Rep. David Roe [R-TN] | Rep. Adrian Smith [R-NE] | Rep. Steve Southerland [R-FL] |
Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH] | Rep. David Valadao [R-CA] | Rep. Timothy Walz [D-MN] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] |
Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2013-09-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
Same As/Similar To
SR26 (Same As) 2013-02-07 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text of measure as introduced: CR S527)
SR588 (Same As) 2014-11-20 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6221; text as passed Senate: CR S6211)
SR588 (Same As) 2014-11-20 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6221; text as passed Senate: CR S6211)
Subjects
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health personnel
Medicare
Rural conditions and development
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health personnel
Medicare
Rural conditions and development
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-resolution/356/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hres356/BILLS-113hres356ih.pdf |