US HR349 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 71-24)
Status: Introduced on April 21 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-05-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 21 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-05-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses support for: (1) designation of a National Autism Awareness Month; and (2) devoting new resources to researching the root causes of autism, identifying the best methods of early intervention and treatment, expanding programs for individuals with autism, and promoting understanding of their special needs.Commends parents and relatives for providing for the special needs of children with autism.Stresses the need to begin early intervention services.Recognizes: (1) the shortage of appropriately trained teachers to teach, assist, and respond to special needs students; and (2) the importance of worker training programs tailored to the needs of developmentally disabled persons.
Title
Expressing support for designation of April 2009 as "National Autism Awareness Month" and supporting efforts to devote new resources to research into the causes and treatment of autism and to improve training and support for individuals with autism and those who care for individuals with autism.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-21 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education. | |
2009-04-22 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. | |
2009-04-21 | Referred to House Education and Labor | |
2009-04-21 | Referred to House Energy and Commerce | |
2009-04-21 | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HR1033 (Same As) 2010-04-27 - The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Child care and development
Child health
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Employment and training programs
Health
Health programs administration and funding
Hereditary and development disorders
Medical research
Neurological disorders
Research administration and funding
Special education
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Child health
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Employment and training programs
Health
Health programs administration and funding
Hereditary and development disorders
Medical research
Neurological disorders
Research administration and funding
Special education
Teaching, teachers, curricula
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-resolution/349/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hres349/BILLS-111hres349ih.pdf |