US HR343 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-13 - On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3728)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-13 - On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3728)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing concern regarding persistent and credible reports of systematic, state-sanctioned organ harvesting from non-consenting prisoners of conscience in the People's Republic of China, including from large numbers of Falun Gong practitioners and members of other religious and ethnic minority groups. Condemns the practice of state-sanctioned forced organ harvesting in China. Calls on China and the Communist Party of China to end the practice of organ harvesting from prisoners of conscience. Encourages the U.S. medical community to help raise awareness of unethical organ transplant practices in China. Demands an end to the 17-year persecution of the Falun Gong spiritual practice and the release of all Falun Gong practitioners and other prisoners of conscience. Calls on China to allow an independent investigation into organ transplant abuses. Calls on the Department of State to: (1) conduct a more detailed analysis on state-sanctioned organ harvesting from non-consenting prisoners of conscience in the annual Human Rights Report, and (2) report annually to Congress on implementation of the immigration provision prohibiting visas to Chinese and other nationals engaged in coerced organ or bodily tissue transplantation.
Title
Expressing concern regarding persistent and credible reports of systematic, state-sanctioned organ harvesting from non-consenting prisoners of conscience in the People's Republic of China, including from large numbers of Falun Gong practitioners and members of other religious and ethnic minority groups.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-13 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3728) |
2016-06-13 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 343. |
2016-06-13 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3727-3730) |
2016-06-13 | House | Ms. Ros-Lehtinen moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended. |
2016-03-16 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2016-03-16 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-01-12 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2016-01-12 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-01-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Asia and the Pacific. |
2015-07-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security. |
2015-06-25 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-06-25 | House | Referred to House Foreign Affairs |
2015-06-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-06-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Asia
China
Congressional oversight
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Detention of persons
Government information and archives
Human rights
International affairs
Medical ethics
Organ and tissue donation and transplantation
Religion
Sanctions
Travel and tourism
Visas and passports
China
Congressional oversight
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Detention of persons
Government information and archives
Human rights
International affairs
Medical ethics
Organ and tissue donation and transplantation
Religion
Sanctions
Travel and tourism
Visas and passports