US HR281 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-26 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-26 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for designation of April 2017 as "Second Chance Month". Honors the work of communities, governmental entities, nonprofit organizations, congregations, employers, and individuals to remove unnecessary legal and societal barriers that prevent an individual with a criminal record from becoming a productive member of society. Calls on the people of the United States to observe Second Chance Month through actions and programs that promote awareness of collateral consequences and provide closure for individuals who have paid their debts.
Title
Expressing support for designation of April 2017 as "Second Chance Month".
Sponsors
Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] | Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D-NY] | Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] |
Rep. Carlos Curbelo [R-FL] | Rep. John Conyers [D-MI] | Rep. Mia Love [R-UT] | Rep. Mark Walker [R-NC] |
Rep. Steve Russell [R-OK] | Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA] | Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL] | Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA] |
Rep. Scott Taylor [R-VA] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2017-04-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR129 (Related) 2017-04-25 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
HR789 (Related) 2018-04-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
SR440 (Related) 2018-04-26 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
HR789 (Related) 2018-04-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
SR440 (Related) 2018-04-26 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal justice information and records
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Congressional tributes
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal justice information and records
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-resolution/281/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hres281/BILLS-115hres281ih.pdf |