US SR440 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution designating April 2018 as "Second Chance Month". Designates April 2018 as Second Chance Month to promote awareness of unnecessary legal and social barriers that prevent an individual with a criminal record from becoming a productive member of society.
Title
A resolution designating April 2018 as "Second Chance Month".
Sponsors
Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] |
Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2497) |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S1846-1847) |
Same As/Similar To
HR789 (Related) 2018-04-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
HR281 (Related) 2017-04-26 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
SR129 (Related) 2017-04-25 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
HR281 (Related) 2017-04-26 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
SR129 (Related) 2017-04-25 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal justice information and records
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Congressional tributes
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal justice information and records
Criminal procedure and sentencing