US HR276 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for the designation of April 5, 2023, as "Barth Syndrome Awareness Day".
Title
Expressing support for the designation of April 5, 2023, as "Barth Syndrome Awareness Day".
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] | Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC] | Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Rep. Neal Dunn [R-FL] |
Rep. Nancy Mace [R-SC] | Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] | Rep. William Timmons [R-SC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2023-04-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2023-04-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR1025 (Same As) 2024-02-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-resolution/276/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hres276/BILLS-118hres276ih.pdf |