US HR220 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Condemning the Government of Iran's state-sponsored persecution of its Baha'i minority and its continued violation of the International Covenants on Human Rights. Condemns the government of Iran's state-sponsored persecution of its Baha'i minority and its continued violation of the International Covenants on Human Rights. Calls on the government of Iran to release the seven imprisoned Baha'i leaders, the eight imprisoned Baha'i educators, and all other prisoners held on account of their religion. Urges the President and the Department of State to utilize available authorities, including the Comprehensive Iran Sanctions, Accountability, and Divestment Act of 2010, to impose sanctions on officials of the government of Iran and other individuals directly responsible for serious human rights abuses, including abuses against the Baha'i community.
Title
Condemning the Government of Iran's state-sponsored persecution of its Baha'i minority and its continued violation of the International Covenants on Human Rights.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-09-21 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. |
2016-09-21 | House | H.Amdt.1420 On agreeing to the Royce amendment (A002) Agreed to without objection. |
2016-09-21 | House | H.Amdt.1420 Amendment (A002) offered by Mr. Royce. |
2016-09-21 | House | H.Amdt.1419 On agreeing to the Royce amendment (A001) Agreed to without objection. |
2016-09-21 | House | H.Amdt.1419 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. Royce. |
2016-09-21 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H5743-5745; text of measure as introduced: CR H5743-5744) |
2016-09-21 | House | Committee on Foreign Affairs discharged. |
2016-09-21 | House | Mr. Royce asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. |
2015-05-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Middle East and North Africa. |
2015-05-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Africa, Global Health, Global Human Rights and International Organizations. |
2015-04-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2015-04-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR148 (Same As) 2015-12-17 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S8831)