US SR148 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-17 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S8831)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-17 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S8831)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution condemning the Government of Iran's state-sponsored persecution of its Baha'i minority and its continued violation of the International Covenants on Human Rights. Condemns the government of Iran's state-sponsored persecution of its Baha'i minority and its continued violation of the International Covenants on Human Rights. Calls on the government of Iran to release the seven imprisoned Baha'i leaders, the nine imprisoned Baha'i educators, and all other prisoners held solely on account of their religion. Calls on the President and Secretary of State, in cooperation with responsible nations, to condemn the government of Iran's continued violation of human rights and demand the release of prisoners held solely on account of their religion. Urges the President and the Secretary to utilize available authorities, including the Comprehensive Iran Sanctions, Accountability, and Divestment Act of 2010, to impose sanctions on officials of the government of Iran and other individuals directly responsible for serious human rights abuses, including abuses against the Baha'i community of Iran.
Title
A resolution condemning the Government of Iran's state-sponsored persecution of its Baha'i minority and its continued violation of the International Covenants on Human Rights.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Kirk [R-IL] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] |
Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] | Sen. Barbara Boxer [D-CA] |
Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] |
Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE] |
Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Kelly Ayotte [R-NH] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] |
Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] |
Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] |
Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Dean Heller [R-NV] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Pat Toomey [R-PA] |
Sen. David Perdue [R-GA] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S8831) |
2015-12-17 | Senate | S.Amdt.2935 Amendment SA 2935 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2015-12-17 | Senate | S.Amdt.2934 Amendment SA 2934 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2015-12-17 | Senate | S.Amdt.2935 Amendment SA 2935 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Kirk. (consideration: CR S8831; text: CR S8831) |
2015-12-17 | Senate | S.Amdt.2934 Amendment SA 2934 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Kirk. (consideration: CR S8831; text: CR S8831) |
2015-12-17 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S8831) |
2015-10-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 263. |
2015-10-08 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report. |
2015-10-08 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2405) |
Same As/Similar To
HR220 (Same As) 2016-09-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.