US HR213 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for designation of October 17, 2017, as the "National Vitiligo Awareness Day". Expresses support for the designation of National Vitiligo Awareness Day. (Vitiligo is a condition in which skin color is lost in patches.) Recognizes the importance of providing support for individuals diagnosed with vitiligo.
Title
Expressing support for designation of October 17, 2017, as the "National Vitiligo Awareness Day".
Sponsors
Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] | Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] |
Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. David Scott [D-GA] |
Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] | Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] | Rep. Keith Ellison [D-MN] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-03-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2017-03-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR757 (Related) 2018-03-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Health
Health promotion and preventive care
Musculoskeletal and skin diseases
Health
Health promotion and preventive care
Musculoskeletal and skin diseases
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-resolution/213/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hres213/BILLS-115hres213ih.pdf |