US HR210 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution supports the designation of Second Chance Month to promote awareness of unnecessary legal and social barriers that prevent an individual with a criminal record from becoming a productive member of society.
Title
Expressing support for the designation of the month of April 2019 as Second Chance Month.
Sponsors
Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] | Rep. Mark Walker [R-NC] | Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA] | Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD] |
Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-03-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR102 (Related) 2019-03-11 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SR549 (Related) 2020-03-20 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S1875-1876)
HR928 (Same As) 2020-04-17 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
SR549 (Related) 2020-03-20 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S1875-1876)
HR928 (Same As) 2020-04-17 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal justice information and records
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Congressional tributes
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal justice information and records
Criminal procedure and sentencing
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-resolution/210/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hres210/BILLS-116hres210ih.pdf |