US HR204 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 71-34)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-13 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-13 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Congratulates the American Dental Association for its 150th anniversary. Commends its work to improve oral health and access to oral health care. Recognizes the dentists who provide charitable and uncompensated oral health care.
Title
Congratulating the American Dental Association for its 150th year of working to improve the public's oral health and promoting dentistry, supporting initiatives to improve access to oral health care services for all Americans, and emphasizing the benefits of prevention of disease through support of community prevention initiatives and promotion of good oral hygiene.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-13 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-05-13 | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 424 - 0 (Roll no. 253). (text: CR 5/12/2009 H5421) | |
2009-05-13 | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5549) | |
2009-05-12 | At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mrs. Christensen objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn. | |
2009-05-12 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 204. | |
2009-05-12 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5420-5422) | |
2009-05-12 | Mrs. Christensen moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution. | |
2009-03-04 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. | |
2009-03-03 | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Dental care
Health
Health personnel
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Congressional tributes
Dental care
Health
Health personnel
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations