US HR147 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

This resolution sets forth the rule for consideration of H.B. 803 (Colorado Wilderness Act of 2021) and H.B. 5 (Equality Act).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 803) to designate certain lands in the State of Colorado as components of the National Wilderness Preservation System, and for other purposes, and providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 5) to prohibit discrimination on the basis of sex, gender identity, and sexual orientation, and for other purposes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-24 - House - On ordering the previous question (Y: 219 N: 211 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - On agreeing to the resolution (Y: 218 N: 208 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2021-02-24HouseOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 218 - 208 (Roll no. 35). (text: CR H602)
2021-02-24HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H609-610)
2021-02-24HouseOn ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 219 - 211 (Roll no. 34). (consideration: CR H608-609)
2021-02-24HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 147.
2021-02-24HouseConsidered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H602-609)
2021-02-23HousePlaced on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 6.
2021-02-23HouseRule provides for 1 hour of general debate on H.R. 803 and one motion to recommit. Rule provides for 90 minutes of general debate on H.R. 5 and one motion to recommit.
2021-02-23HouseThe House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 117-6, by Ms. Scanlon.

Same As/Similar To

HB5 (Related) 2021-03-17 - Committee on the Judiciary. Hearings held.
HR147 (Similar To) 2021-02-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB803 (Related) 2021-03-02 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback