US HR1394 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-0)
Status: Introduced on September 22 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 22 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for the designation of September 2022 as "National Voting Rights Month".
Title
Expressing support for the designation of September 2022 as "National Voting Rights Month".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties. |
2022-09-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight, Management, and Accountability. |
2022-09-22 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on House Administration, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Oversight and Reform, Science, Space, and Technology, Education and Labor, Ways and Means, Financial Services, Ethics, Homeland Security, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2022-09-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR700 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SR401 (Related) 2021-09-30 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S6848-6849)
SR791 (Related) 2022-09-22 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S4972-4973)
SR401 (Related) 2021-09-30 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S6848-6849)
SR791 (Related) 2022-09-22 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S4972-4973)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-resolution/1394/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hres1394/BILLS-117hres1394ih.pdf |