US HR139 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-13)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-13 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-13 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Commemorates the bicentennial of the birth of President Abraham Lincoln. Recognizes his commitment to unity and harmony in the United States. Encourages the people of the United States to recommit to fulfilling his vision of equal rights for all.
Title
Commemorating the life and legacy of President Abraham Lincoln on the bicentennial of his birth.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-13 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-02-13 | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 403 - 0 (Roll no. 71). (text: CR 2/12/2009 H1269) | |
2009-02-13 | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1588-1589) | |
2009-02-12 | At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Lynch objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn. | |
2009-02-12 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 139. | |
2009-02-12 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1269-1272) | |
2009-02-12 | Mr. Lynch moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution. | |
2009-02-11 | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. | |
2009-02-11 | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. | |
2009-02-09 | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
Same As/Similar To
HR165 (Related) 2009-02-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
SR38 (Same As) 2009-02-12 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2169-2170; text as passed Senate: CR S2169-2170; text of measure as introduced: CR S2248)
SR38 (Same As) 2009-02-12 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2169-2170; text as passed Senate: CR S2169-2170; text of measure as introduced: CR S2248)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Due process and equal protection
Presidential administrations
Social sciences and history
U.S. history
Due process and equal protection
Presidential administrations
Social sciences and history
U.S. history