US HR1285 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on July 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-28 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 127.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-28 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 127.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requesting the President to transmit certain information to the House of Representatives relating to a waiver of intellectual property commitments under the World Trade Organization Agreement on Trade-Related Aspects of Intellectual Property Rights.
Title
Requesting the President to transmit certain information to the House of Representatives relating to a waiver of intellectual property commitments under the World Trade Organization Agreement on Trade-Related Aspects of Intellectual Property Rights.
Sponsors
Rep. Adrian Smith [R-NE] | Rep. Kevin Brady [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-28 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 127. |
2022-09-28 | House | Reported adversely by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 117-520. |
2022-09-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported Adversely by Voice Vote. |
2022-09-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2022-09-19 | House | Subcommittee on Trade Discharged. |
2022-07-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade. |
2022-07-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2022-07-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR1169 (Related) 2022-06-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.