US HR1161 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-11)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-27 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-27 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Honors the Centennial Celebration of Women at Marquette University. Commends the school, located in Milwaukee, Wisconsin, for continuing to fulfill its Catholic, Jesuit mission of offering premier higher educational opportunities to all students who have a desire to learn.
Title
Honoring the Centennial Celebration of Women at Marquette University, the first Catholic university in the world to offer co-education as part of its regular undergraduate program.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Austria [R-OH] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Rep. Roscoe Bartlett [R-MD] | Rep. John Boehner [R-OH] |
Rep. Rick Boucher [D-VA] | Rep. Corrine Brown [D-FL] | Rep. Anh Cao [R-LA] | Rep. Lois Capps [D-CA] |
Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Donna Edwards [D-MD] | Rep. Keith Ellison [D-MN] | Rep. Marcia Fudge [D-OH] |
Rep. Alan Grayson [D-FL] | Rep. Deborah Halvorson [D-IL] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] |
Rep. Steve Kagen [D-WI] | Rep. Patrick Kennedy [D-RI] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] | Sen. Mark Kirk [R-IL] |
Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Sen. Cynthia Lummis [R-WY] | Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Donald Manzullo [R-IL] |
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Dennis Moore [D-KS] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. David Obey [D-WI] |
Rep. Ron Paul [R-TX] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Rep. Thomas Petri [R-WI] | Rep. Paul Ryan [R-WI] |
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA] | Rep. James Sensenbrenner [R-WI] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] |
Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Maxine Waters [D-CA] | Rep. Diane Watson [D-CA] | Rep. Lynn Woolsey [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-27 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2010-05-27 | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 380 - 0, 36 Present (Roll no. 308). (text: CR 5/25/2010 text: CR H3784) | |
2010-05-27 | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3887-3888) | |
2010-05-25 | At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Bishop (NY) objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn. | |
2010-05-25 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 1161. | |
2010-05-25 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3784-3785) | |
2010-05-25 | Mr. Bishop (NY) moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution. | |
2010-03-22 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education, Lifelong Learning, and Competitiveness. | |
2010-03-10 | Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor. |
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Higher education
Religion
Wisconsin
Women's education