US HR1156 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 75-11)
Status: Introduced on June 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-13 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-13 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing the commitment of the House of Representatives to building on the twenty years of success of the George McGovern-Robert Dole Food for Education and Child Nutrition Program.
Title
Expressing the commitment of the House of Representatives to building on the twenty years of success of the George McGovern-Robert Dole Food for Education and Child Nutrition Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-13 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-12-13 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9719) |
2022-12-13 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 1156. |
2022-12-13 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9719-9723) |
2022-12-13 | House | Mr. McGovern moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution. |
2022-06-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture. |
2022-06-24 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H5882) |
2022-06-07 | House | Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2022-06-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR709 (Related) 2022-07-14 - Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry. (text: CR S3310)