US HR1154 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-02 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-02 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution condemns QAnon and rejects the conspiracy theories it promotes. The resolution condemns all other groups and ideologies that contribute to the spread of unfounded conspiracy theories and that encourage Americans to destroy property and attack law enforcement officers. The resolution encourages federal law enforcement and homeland security agencies to continue to strengthen their focus on preventing violence, threats, harassment, and other criminal activity by extremists motivated by fringe political conspiracy theories. Finally, the resolution encourages the intelligence community to uncover any foreign support, assistance, or online amplification QAnon receives, as well as any QAnon affiliations, coordination, and contacts with foreign extremist organizations or groups espousing violence.
Title
Condemning QAnon and rejecting the conspiracy theories it promotes.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ] | Rep. Denver Riggleman [R-VA] | Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] | Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] |
Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Roll Calls
2020-10-02 - House - On agreeing to the resolution (Y: 371 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 40) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-02 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-10-02 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 371 - 18, 1 Present (Roll no. 218). (text: CR H5652-5653) |
2020-10-02 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5659) |
2020-10-02 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H. Res. 1154, the Chair put the question on adoption of the resolution and by voice vote, announced the ayes had prevailed. Ms. Jayapal demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced. |
2020-10-02 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2020-10-02 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 1154. |
2020-10-02 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H. Res. 1153 and H. Res. 1154 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments. |
2020-10-02 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 1164. (consideration: CR H5652-5657) |
2020-10-01 | House | Rule H. Res. 1164 passed House. |
2020-10-01 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1164 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H. Res. 1153 and H. Res. 1154 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments. |
2020-09-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-09-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-09-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR1164 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1094 (Related) 2020-08-25 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
HR1094 (Related) 2020-08-25 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Assault and harassment offenses
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Crimes against property
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Internet and video services
Law enforcement officers
Political movements and philosophies
Subversive activities
Violent crime
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Crimes against property
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Internet and video services
Law enforcement officers
Political movements and philosophies
Subversive activities
Violent crime