US HR1153 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-0)
Status: Introduced on April 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizing the designation of the week of April 11 through April 17, 2024, as the seventh annual "Black Maternal Health Week".
Title
Recognizing the designation of the week of April 11 through April 17, 2024, as the seventh annual "Black Maternal Health Week".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2024-04-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2024-04-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR647 (Related) 2024-04-17 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S2829-2830)
HR289 (Related) 2023-05-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition, Foreign Agriculture, and Horticulture.
SR159 (Related) 2023-04-18 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S1213-1214)
HR289 (Related) 2023-05-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition, Foreign Agriculture, and Horticulture.
SR159 (Related) 2023-04-18 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S1213-1214)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-resolution/1153/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hres1153/BILLS-118hres1153ih.pdf |