US HR1115 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 27-9)
Status: Introduced on September 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-03 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-03 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution expresses support for those unjustly imprisoned in Russia, including Paul Whelan and Trevor Reed. The resolution calls for the release of Trevor Reed and calls on Russia to respect his universally recognized human rights.
Title
Calling for the immediate release of Trevor Reed, a United States citizen who was unjustly sentenced to 9 years in a Russian prison.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Conaway [R-TX] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Kevin McCarthy [R-CA] | Rep. Will Hurd [R-TX] |
Rep. Louie Gohmert [R-TX] | Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX] | Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] | Rep. Kenny Marchant [R-TX] |
Rep. Jody Arrington [R-TX] | Rep. Mac Thornberry [R-TX] | Rep. Chip Roy [R-TX] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] |
Rep. Lance Gooden [R-TX] | Rep. Bill Flores [R-TX] | Rep. Dan Crenshaw [R-TX] | Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX] |
Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX] | Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX] | Rep. Al Green [D-TX] | Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX] |
Rep. Kay Granger [R-TX] | Rep. Roger Williams [R-TX] | Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] | Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] |
Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] | Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL] | Rep. Tim Burchett [R-TN] | Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX] |
Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Ron Wright [R-TX] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] |
Rep. Michael Guest [R-MS] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-03 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-12-03 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6090) |
2020-12-03 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 1115. |
2020-12-03 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6090-6092) |
2020-12-03 | House | Mr. Engel moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended. |
2020-10-01 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2020-10-01 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-09-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2020-09-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR667 (Same As) 2020-08-05 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S4945)
Subjects
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Detention of persons
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Health care coverage and access
Health information and medical records
Health technology, devices, supplies
Human rights
International affairs
Rule of law and government transparency
Russia
Detention of persons
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Health care coverage and access
Health information and medical records
Health technology, devices, supplies
Human rights
International affairs
Rule of law and government transparency
Russia