US HR1083 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-0)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizing the significance of "Asian/Pacific American Heritage Month" in May as an important time to celebrate the significant contributions of Asian Americans, Native Hawaiians, and Pacific Islanders to the history of the United States.
Title
Recognizing the significance of "Asian/Pacific American Heritage Month" in May as an important time to celebrate the significant contributions of Asian Americans, Native Hawaiians, and Pacific Islanders to the history of the United States.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2022-05-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR448 (Related) 2021-05-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR653 (Same As) 2022-07-12 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3243; text: 5/26/2022 CR S2757-2758)
SR653 (Same As) 2022-07-12 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3243; text: 5/26/2022 CR S2757-2758)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-resolution/1083/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hres1083/BILLS-117hres1083ih.pdf |