US HR1052 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-21)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-09-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-09-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses gratitude to the members of the Oklahoma Army and Air National Guard and their families for their service and sacrifice on behalf of the United States since September 11, 2001.Recognizes the citizen-soldiers of the Oklahoma National Guard as invaluable to U.S. national security, vital to defending threats both foreign and domestic, and essential for responding to state and national emergencies.
Title
Honoring the members of the Army National Guard and Air National Guard of the State of Oklahoma for their service and sacrifice on behalf of the United States since September 11, 2001.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-14 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2010-09-14 | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 378 - 0 (Roll no. 519). (text: CR H6635-6636) | |
2010-09-14 | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6646-6647) | |
2010-09-14 | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. | |
2010-09-14 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 1052. | |
2010-09-14 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6635-6637) | |
2010-09-14 | Mr. Boren moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution. | |
2010-02-25 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
Same As/Similar To
SR420 (Same As) 2010-02-23 - Referred to the Committee on Armed Services. (text of measure as introduced: CR S711)
SR624 (Same As) 2010-09-15 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7140-7141; text as passed Senate: CR S7140-7141; text of measure as introduced: CR S7139)
SR624 (Same As) 2010-09-15 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7140-7141; text as passed Senate: CR S7140-7141; text of measure as introduced: CR S7139)