US HJR83 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-03 - Became Public Law No: 115-21. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-03 - Became Public Law No: 115-21. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Disapproving the rule submitted by the Department of Labor relating to "Clarification of Employer's Continuing Obligation to Make and Maintain an Accurate Record of Each Recordable Injury and Illness". This joint resolution nullifies the Department of Labor's rule that was published on December 19, 2016, about employers' ongoing obligation to make and maintain records of work-related injuries and illnesses.
Title
Disapproving the rule submitted by the Department of Labor relating to "Clarification of Employer's Continuing Obligation to Make and Maintain an Accurate Record of Each Recordable Injury and Illness".
Sponsors
Rep. Bradley Byrne [R-AL] | Rep. Virginia Foxx [R-NC] | Rep. David Roe [R-TN] | Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA] |
Rep. Drew Ferguson [R-GA] | Rep. Todd Rokita [R-IN] | Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI] | Rep. Francis Rooney [R-FL] |
Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO] | Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI] | Rep. Jody Arrington [R-TX] | Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-22 - Senate - Passed Senate without amendment RC# 93 (Y: 50 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - On passage RC# 121 (Y: 231 N: 191 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - On passage RC# 121 (Y: 231 N: 191 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-03 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 115-21. (TXT | PDF) |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 50 - 48. Record Vote Number: 93. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by motion. (consideration: CR S1900-1924) |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Motion to proceed to consideration of measure agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S1900) |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2017-03-01 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-03-01 | House | On passage Passed by recorded vote: 231 - 191 (Roll no. 121). (text: CR H1421) |
2017-03-01 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1447) |
2017-03-01 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.J. Res. 83, the Chair put the question on passage and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Scott (VA) demanded a recorded vote and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the question of passage until a time to be announced. |
2017-03-01 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2017-03-01 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.J. Res. 83. |
2017-03-01 | House | Provides for consideration of H.R. 998 and H.J.Res. 83. |
2017-03-01 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 150. (consideration: CR H1421-1430) |
2017-02-28 | House | Rule H. Res. 150 passed House. |
2017-02-27 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 150 Reported to House. Provides for consideration of H.R. 998 and H.J.Res. 83. |
2017-02-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce. |
2017-02-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR150 (Related) 2017-02-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SJR27 (Same As) 2017-03-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SJR27 (Same As) 2017-03-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Business records
Congressional oversight
Department of Labor
Government information and archives
Labor and employment
Worker safety and health
Business records
Congressional oversight
Department of Labor
Government information and archives
Labor and employment
Worker safety and health